Date | Outcome/Status | Details |
Nov 18, 2022
|
Fail (OHP not allowed to operate)
|
View PDF
|
Feb 02, 2022
|
Pass with Conditions (OHP allowed to operate)
|
View PDF
|
Jun 28, 2021
|
Pass (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Mar 01, 2021
|
Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Nov 19, 2020
|
Fail (OHP Not allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Oct 06, 2020
|
Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Jun 14, 2019
|
Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Oct 03, 2018
|
Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Feb 10, 2016
|
Pass (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Dec 02, 2015
|
Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Jun 10, 2013
|
Pass (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Mar 21, 2013
|
Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Sep 07, 2012
|
Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|