skip to content

TLC Vision (Canada) Corp. TLC Yonge Eglinton

The information about outcomes/statuses associated with an Out-of-Hospital Premises (OHP) relate only to the OHP procedures captured in regulation and performed at the OHP.

Summary

Current Business Address:
2345 Yonge Street
Suite 212
Toronto Ontario M4P 2E5

DateOutcome/StatusDetails
Oct 17, 2019 Pass View PDF
Nov 20, 2014 Pass View PDF
Sep 05, 2014 Pass with Conditions View PDF
Jun 25, 2014 Pass with Conditions View PDF
Jun 10, 2013 Pass View PDF
Jan 23, 2013 Pass with Conditions View PDF