skip to content

Windsor Essex County Comprehensive Pain Clinic

The information about outcomes/statuses associated with an OHP relate only to the OHP procedures captured in regulation and performed at the OHP. For more information about outcomes/status and what they mean, go to the Public Register.

Summary

Current Business Address:
2525 Roseville Garden Drive
Suite 302
Windsor Ontario N8T 3J8

DateOutcome/StatusDetails
Oct 05, 2018 Pending
Oct 03, 2018 Pass with Conditions View PDF
Feb 10, 2016 Pass View PDF
Dec 02, 2015 Pass with Conditions View PDF
Jun 10, 2013 Pass View PDF
Mar 21, 2013 Pass with Conditions View PDF
Sep 07, 2012 Pass with Conditions View PDF