Date | Outcome/Status | Details |
Oct 29, 2020
|
Pass (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Dec 17, 2019
|
Pass (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Aug 20, 2019
|
Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
May 16, 2018
|
Pass (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
May 02, 2018
|
Fail (OHP Not allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Nov 21, 2016
|
Pass (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
May 17, 2016
|
Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Nov 12, 2013
|
Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Sep 11, 2012
|
Pass (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|