skip to content

Silver Medical Group Centre For Pain Care

The information about outcomes/statuses associated with an Out-of-Hospital Premises (OHP) relate only to the OHP procedures captured in regulation and performed at the OHP.

Summary

Current Business Address:
4646 Dufferin Street
Unit 9
Toronto Ontario M3H 5S4

DateOutcome/StatusDetails
Dec 22, 2021 Pass (OHP Allowed to Operate) View PDF
Feb 25, 2020 Pass (OHP Allowed to Operate) View PDF
Jul 17, 2018 Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate) View PDF
May 11, 2018 Pass (OHP Allowed to Operate) View PDF
Mar 05, 2018 Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate) View PDF
Sep 17, 2014 Pass (OHP Allowed to Operate) View PDF
Apr 22, 2014 Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate) View PDF
Oct 15, 2013 Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate) View PDF
Apr 05, 2013 Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate) View PDF
Dec 21, 2011 Pass (OHP Allowed to Operate) View PDF