skip to content

Mississauga Cosmetic Surgery and Laser Clinic

The information about outcomes/statuses associated with an Out-of-Hospital Premises (OHP) relate only to the OHP procedures captured in regulation and performed at the OHP.

Summary

Current Business Address:
247 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B9

DateOutcome/StatusDetails
May 14, 2021 Pass with Conditions View PDF
Mar 17, 2021 Pass View PDF
Mar 03, 2021 Pass with Conditions View PDF
Aug 23, 2016 Pass View PDF
Jul 09, 2012 Pass View PDF