skip to content

GSH Medical

The information about outcomes/statuses associated with an Out-of-Hospital Premises (OHP) relate only to the OHP procedures captured in regulation and performed at the OHP.

Summary

Current Business Address:
801 Eglinton Ave West
Suite 100
Toronto Ontario M5N 1E3

DateOutcome/StatusDetails
Aug 22, 2019 Pass (OHP Allowed to Operate) View PDF
Mar 16, 2017 In Progress (OHP Allowed to Operate)
Nov 11, 2016 Pass (OHP Allowed to Operate) View PDF
Apr 01, 2015 Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate) View PDF
Jan 31, 2014 Pass (OHP Allowed to Operate) View PDF