skip to content

Allevio Pain Management

The information about outcomes/statuses associated with an Out-of-Hospital Premises (OHP) relate only to the OHP procedures captured in regulation and performed at the OHP.

Summary

Current Business Address:
240 Duncan Mill Road
Suite 101
Toronto Ontario M3B 3R6

DateOutcome/StatusDetails
May 20, 2022 Fail (OHP not allowed to operate) View PDF
Apr 27, 2021 Pass (OHP Allowed to Operate) View PDF
Oct 23, 2020 Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate) View PDF
Jul 16, 2019 Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate) View PDF
Aug 08, 2013 Pass (OHP Allowed to Operate) View PDF