Date | Outcome/Status | Details |
Jul 29, 2022
|
Withdrawn (OHP not allowed to operate)
|
|
May 20, 2022
|
Fail (OHP not allowed to operate)
|
View PDF
|
Apr 27, 2021
|
Pass (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Oct 23, 2020
|
Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Jul 16, 2019
|
Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Aug 08, 2013
|
Pass (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|