skip to content

TLC Laser Eye Centers Mississauga

The information about outcomes/statuses associated with an OHP relate only to the OHP procedures captured in regulation and performed at the OHP. For more information about outcomes/status and what they mean, go to the Public Register.

Summary

Current Business Address:
2201 Bristol Circle
Suite 200
Oakville Ontario L6H 0J8

DateOutcome/StatusDetails
Feb 08, 2019 Pass with Conditions View PDF
Jan 25, 2018 Pass with Conditions View PDF
Mar 31, 2017 Pass with Conditions View PDF
Mar 24, 2017 Fail - OHP procedures not permitted View PDF
Nov 12, 2012 Pass View PDF