skip to content

Digestive Health Clinic

The information about outcomes/statuses associated with an Out-of-Hospital Premises (OHP) relate only to the OHP procedures captured in regulation and performed at the OHP.

Summary

Current Business Address:
330 Highway 7 East
Suite 510
Richmond Hill Ontario L4B 3P8

DateOutcome/StatusDetails
Jul 16, 2019 Pass View PDF
May 23, 2018 Pass View PDF
Apr 24, 2017 Pass with Conditions View PDF
Feb 15, 2017 Pass with Conditions View PDF
Jul 25, 2012 Pass View PDF