skip to content

Woodbine Endoscopy

The information about outcomes/statuses associated with an Out-of-Hospital Premises (OHP) relate only to the OHP procedures captured in regulation and performed at the OHP.

Summary

Current Business Address:
100 Renfrew Drive
Suite 130
Markham Ontario L3R 9R6

DateOutcome/StatusDetails
Oct 18, 2017 Withdrawal
Oct 04, 2017 Fail - OHP procedures not permitted View PDF
Sep 07, 2017 Pass with Conditions View PDF
Jul 27, 2017 Fail - OHP procedures not permitted View PDF
Apr 27, 2015 Pass View PDF
Mar 05, 2015 Pass with Conditions View PDF
Sep 28, 2012 Pass View PDF