skip to content

Crystal Clear Vision

The information about outcomes/statuses associated with an OHP relate only to the OHP procedures captured in regulation and performed at the OHP. For more information about outcomes/status and what they mean, go to the Public Register.

Summary

Current Business Address:
33 Hazelton Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5R 2G3

DateOutcome/StatusDetails
Apr 17, 2019 Pending
Feb 10, 2016 Pass View PDF
Dec 02, 2015 Pass with Conditions View PDF
Dec 22, 2014 Pass View PDF
Oct 15, 2013 Pass with Conditions View PDF