skip to content

Durham Endosurgery Centre

The information about outcomes/statuses associated with an Out-of-Hospital Premises (OHP) relate only to the OHP procedures captured in regulation and performed at the OHP.

Summary

Current Business Address:
95 Bayly Street West
Suite B03
Ajax Ontario L1S 7K8

DateOutcome/StatusDetails
Dec 02, 2020 Pending
Nov 21, 2016 Pass View PDF
Sep 02, 2016 Pass with Conditions View PDF
Mar 05, 2015 Pass with Conditions View PDF
May 08, 2012 Pass View PDF