skip to content

Desai Endoscopy Clinic - Miliken Medical Centre

The information about outcomes/statuses associated with an OHP relate only to the OHP procedures captured in regulation and performed at the OHP. For more information about outcomes/status and what they mean, go to the Public Register.

Summary

Current Business Address:
5651 Steeles Avenue East
Unit 17
Scarborough Ontario M1V 5P6

DateOutcome/StatusDetails
Dec 06, 2017 Withdrawal
Jun 09, 2017 Fail - OHP procedures not permitted View PDF
Apr 24, 2017 Pass with Conditions View PDF
Feb 22, 2017 Fail - OHP procedures not permitted View PDF
Dec 13, 2012 Pass View PDF