Date | Outcome/Status | Details |
May 30, 2023
|
In Progress (OHP allowed to operate)
|
View PDF
|
Jan 16, 2020
|
Pass (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Jun 13, 2019
|
Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Feb 08, 2019
|
Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Jan 25, 2018
|
Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Mar 31, 2017
|
Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Mar 24, 2017
|
Fail (OHP Not allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Nov 12, 2012
|
Pass (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|