Date | Outcome/Status | Details |
Jan 14, 2022
|
Pass (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Oct 21, 2020
|
Pass (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Dec 11, 2019
|
Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Sep 27, 2019
|
Fail (OHP Not allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Aug 22, 2019
|
Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
May 11, 2018
|
Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Dec 15, 2016
|
Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Nov 10, 2016
|
Fail (OHP Not allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Jan 25, 2016
|
Pass (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Oct 30, 2015
|
Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Aug 14, 2015
|
Fail (OHP Not allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Jan 25, 2012
|
Pass (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|