skip to content

Barr Plastic Surgery/Northern Ontario Surgical Centre

The information about outcomes/statuses associated with an OHP relate only to the OHP procedures captured in regulation and performed at the OHP. For more information about outcomes/status and what they mean, go to the Public Register.

Summary

Current Business Address:
205 Douglas Street
Sudbury Ontario P3E 1E9

DateOutcome/StatusDetails
Jul 17, 2018 Pass with Conditions View PDF
Apr 24, 2018 Pass View PDF
Jul 04, 2017 Pass with Conditions View PDF
May 25, 2017 Pass with Conditions View PDF
Mar 30, 2017 Pass with Conditions View PDF
Jul 25, 2012 Pass View PDF