Date | Outcome/Status | Details |
Aug 29, 2018
|
Withdrawn (OHP not allowed to Operate)
|
|
Jul 03, 2018
|
Pass (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Apr 24, 2017
|
Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Nov 21, 2016
|
Pass (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Apr 07, 2016
|
Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Sep 16, 2015
|
Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Aug 15, 2012
|
Pass (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|