skip to content

Karmy Chronic Pain Medical Clinic-Brampton

The information about outcomes/statuses associated with an Out-of-Hospital Premises (OHP) relate only to the OHP procedures captured in regulation and performed at the OHP.

Summary

Current Business Address:
210-164 Queen St. East
Brampton Ontario L6V 1B4

DateOutcome/StatusDetails
Aug 01, 2019 Pending
Jul 05, 2019 Pass View PDF
Oct 29, 2018 Pass with Conditions View PDF
Feb 03, 2017 Pass View PDF
Feb 14, 2012 Pass View PDF