Date | Outcome/Status | Details |
Sep 08, 2023
|
In Progress (OHP allowed to operate)
|
View PDF
|
Oct 22, 2020
|
Pass (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Aug 24, 2020
|
Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Nov 25, 2019
|
Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Aug 22, 2019
|
Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Dec 19, 2017
|
Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|