skip to content

Herzig Eye Institute

The information about outcomes/statuses associated with an Out-of-Hospital Premises (OHP) relate only to the OHP procedures captured in regulation and performed at the OHP.

Summary

Current Business Address:
150 Bloor St West
Suite 210
Toronto Ontario M5S 2X9

DateOutcome/StatusDetails
Jan 11, 2022 Pass (OHP allowed to operate) View PDF
Jan 25, 2018 Pass (OHP Allowed to Operate) View PDF
Dec 22, 2016 Pass (OHP Allowed to Operate) View PDF
Apr 22, 2016 Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate) View PDF
Aug 31, 2011 Pass (OHP Allowed to Operate) View PDF