skip to content

Oak Ridges Aesthetic Centre

The information about outcomes/statuses associated with an Out-of-Hospital Premises (OHP) relate only to the OHP procedures captured in regulation and performed at the OHP.

Summary

Current Business Address:
13291 Yonge Street
Suite 401
Richmond Hill Ontario L4E 4L6

DateOutcome/StatusDetails
Jul 17, 2018 Pass with Conditions View PDF
Mar 19, 2018 Pass View PDF
Feb 07, 2018 Fail - OHP procedures not permitted View PDF
Mar 07, 2016 Pass with Conditions View PDF
Nov 12, 2013 Pass with Conditions View PDF
Jan 25, 2012 Pass View PDF