skip to content

Oakville Endoscopy Centre Inc

The information about outcomes/statuses associated with an Out-of-Hospital Premises (OHP) relate only to the OHP procedures captured in regulation and performed at the OHP.

Summary

Current Business Address:
5-2125 Wyecroft Road
Oakville Ontario L6L 5L7

DateOutcome/StatusDetails
Nov 18, 2019 Pending
Jul 16, 2019 Pass with Conditions View PDF
Sep 25, 2018 Pass with Conditions View PDF
Aug 17, 2017 Pass with Conditions View PDF
Oct 17, 2014 Pass View PDF
Sep 28, 2012 Pass View PDF