Date | Outcome/Status | Details |
Dec 31, 2020
|
Withdrawn (OHP not allowed to Operate)
|
|
Jan 18, 2017
|
Pass (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Nov 17, 2016
|
Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Nov 01, 2016
|
Fail (OHP Not allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Oct 20, 2016
|
Fail (OHP Not allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Apr 30, 2012
|
Pass (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|