skip to content

Provis Endoscopy Services – Ottawa

The information about outcomes/statuses associated with an Out-of-Hospital Premises (OHP) relate only to the OHP procedures captured in regulation and performed at the OHP.

Summary

Current Business Address:
2 Gurdwara Road
Suite 100
Ottawa Ontario K2E 1A2

DateOutcome/StatusDetails
Dec 11, 2019 Pass with Conditions View PDF
Sep 27, 2019 Fail - OHP procedures not permitted View PDF
Aug 22, 2019 Pass with Conditions View PDF
May 11, 2018 Pass with Conditions View PDF
Dec 15, 2016 Pass with Conditions View PDF
Nov 10, 2016 Fail - OHP procedures not permitted View PDF
Jan 25, 2016 Pass View PDF
Oct 30, 2015 Pass with Conditions View PDF
Aug 14, 2015 Fail - OHP procedures not permitted View PDF
Jan 25, 2012 Pass View PDF