Date | Outcome/Status | Details |
Jan 08, 2021
|
Withdrawn (OHP not allowed to Operate)
|
|
Jun 26, 2020
|
Pass (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Sep 20, 2019
|
Pass (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Dec 11, 2018
|
Pass (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Oct 03, 2018
|
Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Feb 10, 2016
|
Pass (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Dec 02, 2015
|
Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Jul 25, 2012
|
Pass (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|