Date | Outcome/Status | Details |
Mar 08, 2023
|
In Progress (OHP allowed to operate)
|
View PDF
|
Mar 09, 2020
|
Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Apr 10, 2019
|
Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Apr 24, 2018
|
Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
May 25, 2017
|
Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Apr 17, 2014
|
Pass (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Jan 31, 2014
|
Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Jul 09, 2012
|
Pass (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|