skip to content

Holly Street Endoscopy Clinic

The information about outcomes/statuses associated with an OHP relate only to the OHP procedures captured in regulation and performed at the OHP. For more information about outcomes/status and what they mean, go to the Public Register.

Summary

Current Business Address:
40 Holly Street
Suite 301
Toronto Ontario M4S 3C3

DateOutcome/StatusDetails
Jan 28, 2019 Pass View PDF
Sep 18, 2018 Pass with Conditions View PDF
Jun 26, 2018 Pass with Conditions View PDF
Jan 22, 2016 Pass View PDF
Jun 27, 2011 Pass View PDF