Date | Outcome/Status | Details |
Sep 19, 2023
|
Pass (OHP allowed to operate)
|
View PDF
|
May 30, 2022
|
Pass with Conditions (OHP allowed to operate)
|
View PDF
|
Mar 04, 2022
|
Pass with Conditions (OHP allowed to operate)
|
View PDF
|
Feb 20, 2018
|
Pass (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Sep 27, 2017
|
Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Oct 18, 2016
|
Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Dec 01, 2015
|
Pass (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Oct 19, 2015
|
Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Jan 31, 2014
|
Pass (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Nov 12, 2013
|
Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Sep 09, 2013
|
Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Nov 04, 2011
|
Pass (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|