Date | Outcome/Status | Details |
Sep 29, 2022
|
Pass (OHP allowed to operate)
|
View PDF
|
Jul 05, 2022
|
In Progress (OHP allowed to operate)
|
|
Jun 08, 2018
|
Pass (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Apr 25, 2018
|
Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Jul 16, 2015
|
Pass (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Feb 11, 2015
|
Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Nov 12, 2013
|
Pass (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Sep 10, 2013
|
Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|