skip to content

Markham Fertility Centre

The information about outcomes/statuses associated with an Out-of-Hospital Premises (OHP) relate only to the OHP procedures captured in regulation and performed at the OHP.

Summary

Current Business Address:
379 Church Street
5th floor
Markham Ontario L6B 0T1

DateOutcome/StatusDetails
Dec 11, 2018 Pass with Conditions View PDF
Oct 03, 2018 Pass with Conditions View PDF
Nov 15, 2017 Pass with Conditions View PDF
Nov 11, 2016 Pass with Conditions View PDF
Mar 01, 2012 Pass View PDF