skip to content

LaFontaine Source De Jeunesse

The information about outcomes/statuses associated with an OHP relate only to the OHP procedures captured in regulation and performed at the OHP. For more information about outcomes/status and what they mean, go to the Public Register.

Summary

Current Business Address:
890-A Yonge Street
Toronto Ontario M4W 3P4

DateOutcome/StatusDetails
May 16, 2018 Pass View PDF
May 02, 2018 Fail - OHP procedures not permitted View PDF
Nov 21, 2016 Pass View PDF
May 17, 2016 Pass with Conditions View PDF
Nov 12, 2013 Pass with Conditions View PDF
Sep 11, 2012 Pass View PDF