skip to content

Cosmedical Rejuvenation Clinic

The information about outcomes/statuses associated with an Out-of-Hospital Premises (OHP) relate only to the OHP procedures captured in regulation and performed at the OHP.

Summary

Current Business Address:
Unit 214
10 York Mills Road
Toronto Ontario M2P 2C2

DateOutcome/StatusDetails
Apr 24, 2020 Pass View PDF
Nov 29, 2019 Pass with Conditions View PDF
Feb 27, 2019 Pass with Conditions View PDF
Aug 08, 2018 Pass View PDF
Jun 27, 2018 Fail - OHP procedures not permitted View PDF
Jan 26, 2017 Pass with Conditions View PDF
Dec 09, 2016 Fail - OHP procedures not permitted View PDF
Aug 24, 2016 Fail - OHP procedures not permitted View PDF
Sep 20, 2012 Pass View PDF