skip to content

Advance Endoscopy & Specialist Centre

The information about outcomes/statuses associated with an OHP relate only to the OHP procedures captured in regulation and performed at the OHP. For more information about outcomes/status and what they mean, go to the Public Register.

Summary

Current Business Address:
2227 South Millway
Suite 303
Mississauga Ontario L5L 3R6

DateOutcome/StatusDetails
Jun 08, 2018 Pass View PDF
Apr 25, 2018 Pass with Conditions View PDF
Jul 16, 2015 Pass View PDF
Feb 11, 2015 Pass with Conditions View PDF
Nov 12, 2013 Pass View PDF
Sep 10, 2013 Pass with Conditions View PDF