Date | Outcome/Status | Details |
Mar 09, 2020
|
Withdrawn (OHP not allowed to Operate)
|
|
Jan 20, 2020
|
Fail (OHP Not allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Sep 27, 2019
|
Fail (OHP Not allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Aug 14, 2019
|
Fail (OHP Not allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Jun 14, 2019
|
Fail (OHP Not allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Apr 05, 2018
|
Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Mar 07, 2018
|
Fail (OHP Not allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Feb 08, 2018
|
Fail (OHP Not allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Jul 18, 2017
|
Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Sep 02, 2016
|
Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Jul 20, 2016
|
Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Mar 03, 2016
|
Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|