skip to content

Tri City Colonoscopy Clinic

The information about outcomes/statuses associated with an OHP relate only to the OHP procedures captured in regulation and performed at the OHP. For more information about outcomes/status and what they mean, go to the Public Register.

Summary

Current Business Address:
50 Sportsworld Crossing Road
Unit 200
Kitchener Ontario N2P 0A4

DateOutcome/StatusDetails
Jun 26, 2018 Pass View PDF
Apr 04, 2018 Pass with Conditions View PDF
Apr 24, 2017 Pass with Conditions View PDF
Oct 19, 2015 Pass View PDF
Aug 31, 2015 Pass with Conditions View PDF
Apr 27, 2012 Pass View PDF