Date | Outcome/Status | Details |
Oct 01, 2018
|
Withdrawn (OHP not allowed to Operate)
|
|
Sep 06, 2018
|
Fail (OHP Not allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Aug 03, 2018
|
Fail (OHP Not allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Jul 09, 2018
|
Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Jan 31, 2014
|
Pass (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Apr 27, 2012
|
Pass (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|