skip to content

Ontario Colonoscopy Clinics

The information about outcomes/statuses associated with an Out-of-Hospital Premises (OHP) relate only to the OHP procedures captured in regulation and performed at the OHP.

Summary

Current Business Address:
Etobicoke Wellness Centre
115 Humber College Blvd
Suite 715
Etobicoke Ontario M9V 0A9

DateOutcome/StatusDetails
May 11, 2021 Pending
Feb 06, 2019 Pass View PDF
Oct 19, 2018 Pass with Conditions View PDF
Jun 28, 2016 Pass View PDF
Apr 27, 2012 Pass View PDF