Date | Outcome/Status | Details |
Oct 18, 2017
|
Withdrawn (OHP not allowed to Operate)
|
|
Oct 04, 2017
|
Fail (OHP Not allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Sep 07, 2017
|
Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Jul 27, 2017
|
Fail (OHP Not allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Apr 27, 2015
|
Pass (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Mar 05, 2015
|
Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Sep 28, 2012
|
Pass (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|