Date | Outcome/Status | Details |
Oct 24, 2020
|
Withdrawn (OHP not allowed to Operate)
|
|
Jul 20, 2020
|
Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Dec 11, 2019
|
Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Nov 20, 2019
|
Fail (OHP Not allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Aug 21, 2018
|
Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|