skip to content

North York Endoscopy Centre

The information about outcomes/statuses associated with an Out-of-Hospital Premises (OHP) relate only to the OHP procedures captured in regulation and performed at the OHP.

Summary

Current Business Address:
2 Champagne Drive
Unit B19
Toronto Ontario M3J 2C5

DateOutcome/StatusDetails
Aug 29, 2022 Pass (OHP allowed to operate) View PDF
Mar 22, 2022 In Progress (OHP allowed to operate)
Feb 08, 2019 Pass (OHP Allowed to Operate) View PDF
Oct 27, 2017 Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate) View PDF
Sep 02, 2016 Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate) View PDF
Mar 05, 2015 Pass (OHP Allowed to Operate) View PDF
Jan 25, 2012 Pass (OHP Allowed to Operate) View PDF