skip to content

Seekers Centre for Integrative Medicine

The information about outcomes/statuses associated with an Out-of-Hospital Premises (OHP) relate only to the OHP procedures captured in regulation and performed at the OHP.

Summary

Current Business Address:
942 Merivale Road
Ottawa Ontario K1Z 5Z9

DateOutcome/StatusDetails
Sep 21, 2020 Fail - OHP procedures not permitted View PDF
Aug 02, 2019 Pass View PDF
Nov 27, 2018 Pass with Conditions View PDF
Aug 08, 2018 Pass with Conditions View PDF
Jul 24, 2018 Fail - OHP procedures not permitted View PDF
Mar 14, 2013 Pass View PDF
Jan 28, 2013 Pass with Conditions View PDF