skip to content

Oakville Vascular

The information about outcomes/statuses associated with an Out-of-Hospital Premises (OHP) relate only to the OHP procedures captured in regulation and performed at the OHP.

Summary

Current Business Address:
2035 Cornwall Road
Oakville Ontario L6J 7S2

DateOutcome/StatusDetails
Jan 08, 2021 Withdrawal
Aug 24, 2020 Pass with Conditions View PDF
Nov 25, 2019 Pass with Conditions View PDF
Dec 22, 2016 Pass View PDF
Dec 13, 2012 Pass View PDF