skip to content

The Pain Clinic

The information about outcomes/statuses associated with an Out-of-Hospital Premises (OHP) relate only to the OHP procedures captured in regulation and performed at the OHP.

Summary

Current Business Address:
Unit C8
2 Champagne Drive
Toronto Ontario M3J 2C5

DateOutcome/StatusDetails
May 10, 2022 In Progress (OHP allowed to operate)
Nov 15, 2021 Pass (OHP Allowed to Operate) View PDF
Jan 22, 2021 Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate) View PDF
Aug 21, 2018 Pass (OHP Allowed to Operate) View PDF
Jun 22, 2018 Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate) View PDF
May 25, 2017 Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate) View PDF
Mar 05, 2015 Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate) View PDF