Date | Outcome/Status | Details |
Nov 16, 2022
|
Pass (OHP allowed to operate)
|
View PDF
|
Nov 15, 2021
|
Pass (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Jan 22, 2021
|
Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Aug 21, 2018
|
Pass (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Jun 22, 2018
|
Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
May 25, 2017
|
Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Mar 05, 2015
|
Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|