skip to content

Family Practice and Chronic Pain Management

The information about outcomes/statuses associated with an OHP relate only to the OHP procedures captured in regulation and performed at the OHP. For more information about outcomes/status and what they mean, go to the Public Register.

Summary

Current Business Address:
688 Coxwell Avenue
Suite 202
Toronto Ontario M4C 3B7

DateOutcome/StatusDetails
Jan 24, 2019 Pending
Sep 27, 2018 Pass with Conditions View PDF
Sep 14, 2018 Fail - OHP procedures not permitted View PDF
Feb 03, 2017 Pass View PDF
Mar 19, 2012 Pass View PDF