skip to content

Brampton Endoscopy Centre

The information about outcomes/statuses associated with an OHP relate only to the OHP procedures captured in regulation and performed at the OHP. For more information about outcomes/status and what they mean, go to the Public Register.

Summary

Current Business Address:
10886 Hurontario Street
Suite A7
Brampton Ontario L7A 3R9

DateOutcome/StatusDetails
Sep 25, 2018 Pass View PDF
Jun 08, 2018 Pass View PDF
Apr 04, 2018 Pass with Conditions View PDF
Mar 01, 2017 Pass View PDF
Sep 20, 2012 Pass View PDF