skip to content

Clear Medical Imaging

The information about outcomes/statuses associated with an Out-of-Hospital Premises (OHP) relate only to the OHP procedures captured in regulation and performed at the OHP.

Summary

Current Business Address:
13278 Teccumseh Road East
Suite 10
Tecumseh Ontario N8N 3T6

DateOutcome/StatusDetails
Jan 25, 2018 Pass with Conditions View PDF
Sep 27, 2017 Pass with Conditions View PDF
Oct 06, 2016 Pass with Conditions View PDF
Oct 19, 2015 Pass with Conditions View PDF
Jan 06, 2015 Pass with Conditions View PDF