skip to content

Uptown Eye Specialists

The information about outcomes/statuses associated with an Out-of-Hospital Premises (OHP) relate only to the OHP procedures captured in regulation and performed at the OHP.

Summary

Current Business Address:
2180 Steeles Avenue West
Suite 221
Concord Ontario L4K 2Z5

DateOutcome/StatusDetails
Apr 07, 2016 Pass View PDF
Feb 29, 2016 Pass with Conditions View PDF
Apr 27, 2015 Pass with Conditions View PDF
Jan 07, 2015 Pass with Conditions View PDF
Mar 10, 2014 Pass with Conditions View PDF
Apr 09, 2012 Pass View PDF